+ − Summary
+ − Actions (15)
On August 26, 1992 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 102-362.
- Signed by President.
On August 17, 1992 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On August 12, 1992 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On August 11, 1992 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On August 11, 1992 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
- Senate Committee on Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On July 22, 1992 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
On July 21, 1992 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On passage Passed without objection.
- Mr. Sawyer asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
- Considered by unanimous consent.
- Committee on Post Office and Civil Service discharged.
On February 18, 1992 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Census and Population.
- Referred to the House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor