+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 16, 1973 in the House:
- Public law 93-35.
- Signed by President.
On May 4, 1973 in the House:
- Measure presented to President.
On May 3, 1973 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
- House receded and concurred in certain Senate amendments.
On April 30, 1973 in the House:
- Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 93-158.
On April 30, 1973 in the Senate:
- Conference scheduled in Senate.
On April 19, 1973 in the House:
- Conference scheduled in House.
On April 18, 1973 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, amended.
On March 5, 1973 in the House:
- Measure passed House, roll call #33 .
On March 1, 1973 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Education and Labor, H. Rept. 93-37.
On February 28, 1973 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Education and Labor.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor