+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On December 23, 1987 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 100-209.
- Signed by President.
On December 22, 1987 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On December 21, 1987 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On December 20, 1987 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On December 19, 1987 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On December 19, 1987 in the Senate:
- Senate agreed to the House amendments to the Senate amendment by Voice Vote.
On December 18, 1987 in the Senate:
- Message on House action received in Senate and held at desk: House amendments to Senate amendments.
- House Concurred, in Senate Amendments , with Amendments by Unanimous Consent.
On December 7, 1987 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On December 4, 1987 in the Senate:
- S.AMDT.1251 Proposed by Senator Dole. To provide that the project referred to as the Clarks Hill Dam, Reservoir and Highway transversing the dam on the Savannah River, Georgia and South Carolina, shall hereafter and designated as the Strom Thurmond Dam, Reservoir, and Highway.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- S.AMDT.1251 Amendment SP 1251 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- Passed Senate with an amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
On November 19, 1987 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 450.
On November 17, 1987 in the House:
- Passed House by Yea-Nay Vote: 414 - 0 .
On November 16, 1987 in the House:
- Considered by House Unfinished Business.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On November 5, 1987 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On October 27, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Human Rights and International Organizations.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Europe and the Middle East.
On October 14, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.1251
To provide that the project referred to as the Clarks Hill Dam, Reservoir and Highway transversing the dam on the Savannah River, Georgia and South Carolina, shall hereafter and designated as the Strom Thurmond Dam, Reservoir, and Highway.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor