+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On November 28, 1989 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 101-182.
- Signed by President.
On November 17, 1989 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On November 16, 1989 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On November 16, 1989 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On November 15, 1989 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On November 15, 1989 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Voice Vote.
On November 13, 1989 in the House:
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Clay moved to suspend the rules and pass the resolution, as amended.
- Mr. Gillmor demanded a second on the motion to suspend the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- On ordering a second Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On October 18, 1989 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Task Force on Libraries and Memorials Discharged.
- Ordered to be Reported.
On July 19, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Libraries and Memorials.
On July 12, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor