+ − Actions (15)
On October 1, 1982 in the House:
- Considered by House Failed to Receive Two-thirds Vote Necessary for Constitutional Amendment.
- Called up by House by Rule.
- Rule Passed House.
- H.AMDT.895 Amendment Failed of Passage in Committee of Whole by Recorded Vote: 77 - 346 .
- H.AMDT.895 Amendment Offered by Representative Alexander. A substitute amendment. 1) The President Shall submit to Congress, within 15 days of convening, a proposed statement of receipts and outlays for the next fiscal year in which outlays are not greater than receipts. 2) Prior to each fiscal year Congress shall adopt a statement of receipts and outlays in which outlays do not exceed receipts, except when Congress declare a national emergency; outlays may exceed receipts. 3) Congress shall implement this by legislation. 4) This article does not provide any person with any right not other wise provided by the Constitution or law. 5) The President has no power to enforce this not provided by law. 6) This article shall take effect for the second fiscal year beginning after ratification.
On September 30, 1982 in the House:
- Rules Committee Resolution H.Res.604 Reported to House.
- Committee on Rules Granted a Modified Closed Rule providing for Two Hours of General Debate.
On August 18, 1982 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On August 5, 1982 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On August 4, 1982 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On August 3, 1982 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On May 19, 1982 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On May 5, 1982 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On November 2, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Monopolies and Commercial Law.
On October 29, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
+ − Amendment
H.AMDT.895
A substitute amendment. 1) The President Shall submit to Congress, within 15 days of convening, a proposed statement of receipts and outlays for the next fiscal year in which outlays are not greater than receipts. 2) Prior to each fiscal year Congress shall adopt a statement of receipts and outlays in which outlays do not exceed receipts, except when Congress declare a national emergency; outlays may exceed receipts. 3) Congress shall implement this by legislation. 4) This article does not provide any person with any right not other wise provided by the Constitution or law. 5) The President has no power to enforce this not provided by law. 6) This article shall take effect for the second fiscal year beginning after ratification.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor