+ − Summary
+ − Actions (7)
On May 2, 1984 in the House:
- Unfavorable Executive Comment Received From USDA.
On February 16, 1984 in the House:
- Unfavorable Executive Comment Received From Commerce.
On October 17, 1983 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from State, Commerce, USDA.
On September 22, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on International Economic Policy and Trade.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Europe and the Middle East.
- Referred to Subcommittee on International Security and Scientific Affairs.
On September 12, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor