+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 8, 1973 in the House:
- Public law 93-9.
- Signed by President.
On February 28, 1973 in the House:
- Measure presented to President.
- Cleared for White House
On February 28, 1973 in the Senate:
- Senate agreed to conference report.
On February 28, 1973 in the House:
- House receded and concurred in certain Senate amendments.
- House agreed to conference report.
On February 27, 1973 in the House:
- Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 93-33.
- Conference scheduled in House.
On February 26, 1973 in the Senate:
- Conference scheduled in Senate.
- Measure passed Senate, amended.
On February 22, 1973 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Appropriations with amendment, S. Rept. 93-44.
On February 21, 1973 in the House:
- Measure passed House, roll call #20 .
On February 21, 1973 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations.
On February 20, 1973 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Appropriations, H. Rept. 93-20.
- Referred to House Committee on Appropriations.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor