+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On November 9, 1987 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 100-158.
- Signed by President.
On October 30, 1987 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On October 27, 1987 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 27, 1987 in the Senate:
- House Agreed to Senate Amendments by Unanimous Consent.
On October 6, 1987 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 1, 1987 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
On September 24, 1987 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 333.
- Committee on Rules. Reported to Senate by Senator Ford with an amendment and with a preamble. With written report No. 100-172.
On September 23, 1987 in the Senate:
- Committee on Rules. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
On July 23, 1987 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules.
On July 22, 1987 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On July 21, 1987 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On July 15, 1987 in the House:
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 34.
- Reported to House by House Committee on House Administration. Report No: 100-221.
On July 9, 1987 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 30, 1987 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 18, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Libraries and Memorials.
On June 10, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on House Administration.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor