+ − Summary
+ − Actions (14)
On November 2, 1979 in the Senate:
- Public Law 96-99.
- Signed by President.
On November 1, 1979 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On November 1, 1979 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On October 31, 1979 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 31, 1979 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Committee on the Judiciary discharged in Senate.
On October 29, 1979 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on the Judiciary.
On October 26, 1979 in the House:
- Measure passed House.
- Measure considered in House.
- Committee on Post Office and Civil Service discharged in House.
On January 15, 1979 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor