+ − Summary
+ − Actions (13)
On November 12, 1985 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 99-147.
- Signed by President.
On November 7, 1985 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On November 6, 1985 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On November 4, 1985 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On November 4, 1985 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate in lieu of S.J.RES. 208 without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
- Senate Committee on Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On October 30, 1985 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
On October 30, 1985 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House by Unanimous Consent.
- House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On May 13, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Census and Population.
On May 8, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor