+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On August 14, 1991 in the Senate:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 102-93.
On August 2, 1991 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On August 1, 1991 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On July 31, 1991 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On July 31, 1991 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
On July 30, 1991 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice.
On July 29, 1991 in the House:
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Fascell moved to suspend the rules and pass the resolution, as amended.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On July 23, 1991 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported .
On July 10, 1991 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 9, 1991 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 17, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Rights and International Organizations.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Europe and the Middle East.
On June 11, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Census and Population.
On June 4, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
- Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor