+ − Summary
+ − Actions (7)
On April 8, 1986 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 13, 1985 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From State.
On May 9, 1985 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from State.
On May 3, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Human Rights and International Organizations.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Europe and the Middle East.
On April 25, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor