+ − Summary
+ − Actions (15)
On May 25, 1989 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 101-35.
- Signed by President.
On May 16, 1989 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On May 15, 1989 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On May 11, 1989 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On May 11, 1989 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
On May 10, 1989 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice.
On May 9, 1989 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On passage Passed without objection.
- Considered by unanimous consent.
- Committee on Post Office and Civil Service discharged.
- Mr. Sawyer asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
On May 2, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Census and Population.
On April 25, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor