+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On October 19, 1996 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 104-321.
- Signed by President.
On October 10, 1996 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On October 4, 1996 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 3, 1996 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 3, 1996 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On September 24, 1996 in the House:
- Mr. Gekas moved to suspend the rules and pass the resolution.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On September 24, 1996 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice.
On September 18, 1996 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On September 17, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Commercial and Administrative Law.
- Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor