+ − Summary
+ − Actions (12)
On March 17, 1987 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 100-11.
- Signed by President.
On March 6, 1987 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On March 4, 1987 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On March 3, 1987 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On March 3, 1987 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
On February 26, 1987 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 19.
On February 24, 1987 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On February 19, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Hazardous Materials.
- Referred to House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor