+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On October 27, 1986 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 99-558.
- Signed by President.
On October 21, 1986 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On October 20, 1986 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On October 17, 1986 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 17, 1986 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Voice Vote.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- House Agreed to Senate Amendments by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.3482 Amendment SP 3482 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.3482 Proposed by Senator Simpson for Senator McClure. Of a technical nature.
On September 19, 1986 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator McClure with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 99-462.
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 946.
On September 17, 1986 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On September 8, 1986 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources requested executive comment from Interior Department, OMB.
On November 7, 1985 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
On November 6, 1985 in the House:
- Passed House by Yea-Nay Vote: 408 - 0 .
On November 4, 1985 in the House:
- Considered by House Unfinished Business.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On October 29, 1985 in the House:
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 202.
- Reported to House by House Committee on House Administration. Report No: 99-340.
On October 23, 1985 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 13, 1985 in the House:
- Hearings Held by Task Force on Libraries and Memorials.
On February 7, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on House Administration.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.3482
Of a technical nature.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor