+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On November 23, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 107-294.
On November 21, 2002 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On November 20, 2002 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On November 19, 2002 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On November 19, 2002 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 92 - 2.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
On November 14, 2002 in the Senate:
- Read twice. Ordered Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 762.
On November 13, 2002 in the House:
- Mr. Obey moved to recommit with instructions to Appropriations.
- Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
- Considered as privileged matter.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.J. Res. 124 .
- The previous question was ordered without objection.
- On passage Passed by recorded vote: 270 - 143 .
- Floor summary: DEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Obey motion to recommit with instructions.
- The previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection.
- On motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 196 - 216 .
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On November 13, 2002 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On November 13, 2002 in the House:
- Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 602 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.J. Res. 124 and H.R. 5708 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments.
+ − Vote
November 13, 2002: On Passage
- Yeas: 270
- Nays: 143
- Absent: 18
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor