+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On July 21, 1987 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 100-76.
- Signed by President.
On July 16, 1987 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On July 15, 1987 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On July 15, 1987 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Passed Senate in lieu of S.J.RES. 140 with an amendment and an amendment to the Title and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- Senate Committee on Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
- House Agreed to Senate Amendments by Voice Vote.
On March 25, 1987 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
On March 24, 1987 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
- House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On February 11, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Census and Population.
On January 29, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor