+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On September 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On September 15, 1998 in the House:
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 310 - 93 .
- Considered as unfinished business.
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 5, rule I, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. McCollum moved to suspend the rules and pass the resolution, as amended.
On May 11, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime.
On May 4, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and Environment, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Chairman.
On April 30, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to House Commerce
- Referred to House Judiciary
- Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor