+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On October 29, 2002 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 107-255.
- Signed by President.
On October 17, 2002 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On October 11, 2002 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 11, 2002 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
On October 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice.
On October 9, 2002 in the House:
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 410 - 0 .
- Considered as unfinished business.
On October 7, 2002 in the House:
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed until Oct. 8.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.J. Res. 113 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Isakson moved to suspend the rules and pass the resolution.
On October 2, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor