+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On November 9, 2000 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 106-483.
- Signed by President.
On November 2, 2000 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On October 30, 2000 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the motion.
On October 30, 2000 in the Senate:
- Mr. Bachus moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments.
On October 27, 2000 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 26, 2000 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- S.AMDT.4346 Amendment SA 4346 proposed by Senator Brownback for Senator Sessions. To propose a substitute.
- S.AMDT.4346 Amendment SA 4346 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.4347 Amendment SA 4347 proposed by Senator Brownback for Senator Sessions. To amend the preamble.
- S.AMDT.4347 Amendment SA 4347 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- Passed Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent.
On September 13, 2000 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
On September 12, 2000 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.J. Res. 102 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Bachus moved to suspend the rules and pass the resolution.
On June 16, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
On June 14, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
+ − Amendments (2)
S.AMDT.4346
To propose a substitute.
S.AMDT.4347
To amend the preamble.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor