+ − Summary
+ − Actions (13)
On November 15, 1983 in the House:
- Failed to Receive 2/3's Vote to Suspend and Pass by Yea-Nay Vote: 278 - 147 .
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On November 9, 1983 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On November 7, 1983 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On November 3, 1983 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On October 26, 1983 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On October 20, 1983 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On September 14, 1983 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On July 13, 1983 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On February 4, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Civil and Constitutional Rights.
On January 3, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor