+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On September 24, 1997 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 174.
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported to Senate by Senator Helms without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
On July 23, 1997 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
On July 22, 1997 in the House:
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Mr. Gilman moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Luther objected to the Yea - Nay vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
- Considered as unfinished business.
- On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by recorded vote : 418 - 1, 1 Present .
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On June 25, 1997 in the House:
- Committee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules, by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 24, 1997 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 23, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Africa.
On June 18, 1997 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On June 16, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on International Relations.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Vote
July 22, 1997: Suspend the Rules and Agree
- Yeas: 418
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 14
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor