+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (27)
On October 21, 1997 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
On October 21, 1997 in the Senate:
- Mr. Saxton moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 21, 1997 in the House:
- On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to by voice vote.
On October 9, 1997 in the Senate:
- Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent.
On September 30, 1997 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 186.
- Committee on Commerce. Reported to Senate by Senator McCain with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amended preamble. With written report No. 105-94 .
On June 19, 1997 in the Senate:
- Committee on Commerce. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On May 13, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to the Committee on Commerce.
On April 24, 1997 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On April 23, 1997 in the House:
- Mr. Saxton moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
- Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 19.
- Reported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 105-69 .
- On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
On April 16, 1997 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 19, 1997 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 13, 1997 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On February 10, 1997 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from Commerce, Interior, State.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries Conservation, Wildlife and Oceans.
On January 9, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Resources.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor