+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (11)
On September 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On September 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On September 7, 2011 in the House:
- Mr. Denham moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 67 .
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- Considered as unfinished business.
- On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 379 - 0 .
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On July 29, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
On July 28, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor