+ − Summary
+ − Actions (10)
On June 27, 1978 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Call of calendar in Senate.
On June 22, 1978 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Finance, S. Rept. 95-949.
On May 23, 1978 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Finance.
On May 22, 1978 in the House:
- Measure passed House, roll call #348 .
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by unanimous consent in House.
On May 3, 1978 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Ways and Means, H. Rept. 95-1106.
On April 10, 1978 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor