+ − Actions (6)
On July 8, 1981 in the House:
- Favorable Executive Comment Received From State.
On July 2, 1981 in the House:
- Favorable Executive Comment Received From State.
On April 20, 1981 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from State.
On February 12, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Human Rights and International Organizations.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Europe and the Middle East.
On February 3, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor