+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 15, 1999 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On April 14, 1999 in the Senate:
- Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On March 24, 1999 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On March 23, 1999 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 47 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Franks moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
On March 16, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 25.
- Reported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 106-59 .
On March 11, 1999 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 10, 1999 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On March 9, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, Hazardous Materials and Pipeline Transportation.
- Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor