+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On May 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On May 11, 2011 in the House:
- Mr. Denham asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
- Committee on Transportation discharged.
- Considered by unanimous consent.
- On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On May 3, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
On May 2, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor