+ − Summary
+ − Actions (14)
On September 21, 1984 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
On September 18, 1984 in the House:
- Resolution Agreed to in House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On September 6, 1984 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Human Rights and International Organizations Discharged.
- Subcommittee on International Operations Discharged.
On April 10, 1984 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On February 10, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Africa.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Human Rights and International Organizations.
- Referred to Subcommittee on International Operations.
On February 2, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor