+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On October 2, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
On September 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On September 18, 2008 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.
- Considered as unfinished business.
On September 17, 2008 in the House:
- At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Graves objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 408 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Ms. Brown, Corrine moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
On August 1, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
On July 31, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor