+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 19, 2002 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On June 18, 2002 in the Senate:
- Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
On June 13, 2002 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 418.
- Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
- Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On May 15, 2002 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
On May 14, 2002 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 387 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Barton moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
On April 26, 2002 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On April 25, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Science.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor