+ − Actions (9)
On August 18, 1982 in the Senate:
- Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
On August 13, 1982 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Regular Orders. Calendar No. 755.
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported to Senate by Senator Percy without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
On August 10, 1982 in the Senate:
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On August 9, 1982 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
On August 5, 1982 in the House:
- Resolution Agreed to in House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House by Unanimous Consent.
- House Committee on Foreign Affairs Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On July 28, 1982 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor