+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (10)
On October 20, 2000 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 19, 2000 in the Senate:
- Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
On October 11, 2000 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On October 10, 2000 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 376 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mrs. Morella moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
On July 31, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Civil Service.
On July 18, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Government Reform.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor