+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On August 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
On July 31, 2008 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On July 30, 2008 in the House:
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 358 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Ellsworth moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
On June 23, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
On May 20, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor