+ − Summary
+ − Actions (12)
On June 28, 1984 in the Senate:
- Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
On June 26, 1984 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 1014.
On June 19, 1984 in the House:
- Resolution Agreed to in House by Yea-Nay Vote: 403 - 0 .
On June 18, 1984 in the House:
- Considered by House Unfinished Business.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
- House Committee on Foreign Affairs Discharged by Suspension of Rules.
- House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service Discharged by Suspension of Rules.
On May 2, 1984 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Human Rights and International Organizations.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Europe and the Middle East.
- Referred to Subcommittee on International Operations.
On April 26, 1984 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
- Referred to House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor