+ − Summary
+ − Actions (12)
On July 13, 1990 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
On July 12, 1990 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection.
- Committee on Foreign Affairs discharged.
- Mr. Solarz asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
- Considered by unanimous consent.
On July 11, 1990 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported.
On June 21, 1990 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
On April 2, 1990 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Asian and Pacific Affairs.
On March 21, 1990 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor