+ − Summary
+ − Actions (9)
On August 8, 1988 in the House:
- Favorable Executive Comment Received From DOD.
On August 3, 1988 in the House:
- Favorable Executive Comment Received From State.
On May 6, 1988 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from State, DOD.
On May 2, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Europe and the Middle East.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Arms Control, International Security and Science.
On April 26, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Military Personnel and Compensation.
- Executive Comment Requested from DOD.
On April 19, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
- Referred to House Committee on Armed Services.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor