+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 7, 2002 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
On March 6, 2002 in the House:
- House resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 353 and Rule XXIII.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 353 .
- Rule provides for consideration of H. Con. Res. 275 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Bill is open to amendments.
- Rule H. Res. 353 passed House.
- The Speaker designated the Honorable John Shimkus to act as Chairman of the Committee.
- GENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate on H. Con. Res. 275 .
- The House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H. Con. Res. 275 .
- The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
- On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.
On March 5, 2002 in the House:
- Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 353 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H. Con. Res. 275 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Bill is open to amendments.
On March 4, 2002 in the House:
- Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 126.
- Reported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 107-362 .
On February 27, 2002 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On December 6, 2001 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On November 26, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries Conservation, Wildlife and Oceans.
On November 16, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Resources.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor