+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
- Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On February 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
On February 6, 2008 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 273 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Hodes moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
On January 29, 2008 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On December 19, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor