+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On March 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On February 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
On December 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On December 17, 2007 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 270 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Conyers moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
- Referred to House House Administration
- Referred to House Judiciary
- Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor