+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On October 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
On October 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On October 3, 1994 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Menendez moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
On September 13, 1994 in the House:
- Subcommittee on International Operations Discharged.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
On August 24, 1994 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received from State.
On July 20, 1994 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from State.
On July 19, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Labor Standards, Occupational Health and Safety.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Labor-Management Relations.
On July 5, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on International Operations.
On June 22, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
- Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor