+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On April 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.3729 Amendment SA 3729 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.3729 Amendment SA 3729 proposed by Senator Casey for Senator Coburn. In the nature of a substitute.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- Received in the Senate.
On April 21, 2010 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 255 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Ms. Speier moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
On April 14, 2010 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 19, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.3729
In the nature of a substitute.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor