+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (17)
On August 11, 1994 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On August 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
- Senate Committee on Rules discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On August 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Rules.
On August 3, 1994 in the House:
- Committee on House Administration discharged.
- Mr. Manton asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
- Considered by unanimous consent.
- H.AMDT.813 Amendment in the nature of a substitute offered by Mr. Manton. Amendment in the nature of a substitute authorizes the printing, as a House document, of eulogies of the late President Richard M. Nixon, as expressed in the House of Representatives and the Senate.
- H.AMDT.813 On agreeing to the Manton amendment Agreed to without objection.
- On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection.
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On June 30, 1994 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by Voice Vote.
On June 28, 1994 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 17, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Personnel and Police.
On May 11, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
+ − Amendment
H.AMDT.813
Amendment in the nature of a substitute authorizes the printing, as a House document, of eulogies of the late President Richard M. Nixon, as expressed in the House of Representatives and the Senate.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor