+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On November 26, 1991 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
On November 20, 1991 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On November 20, 1991 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 426 - 0 .
- Considered as unfinished business.
On November 19, 1991 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Mr. Owens moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 5, rule I, the chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed until Nov. 20.
On November 14, 1991 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
On November 5, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Europe and the Middle East.
On October 23, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor