+ − Summary
+ − Actions (18)
On November 22, 1989 in the Senate:
- Referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.
On November 18, 1989 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On November 17, 1989 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- The chair announced that a second on the motion to suspend the rules is not required.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Luken, Thomas moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
On November 16, 1989 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported.
On November 9, 1989 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported.
On November 7, 1989 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Legislation and National Security.
On November 6, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Transportation and Hazardous Materials.
On November 1, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Referred to the House Committee on Government Operations.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor