+ − Actions (10)
On November 19, 1981 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
On November 17, 1981 in the House:
- Resolution Agreed to in House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On November 12, 1981 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar No: 72.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Public Works and Transportation. Report No: 97-326.
On November 5, 1981 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Water Resources Discharged.
On October 29, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Water Resources.
On October 15, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Public Works and Transportation.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor