+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On November 19, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to the Committee on Commerce.
On November 2, 1999 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On November 1, 1999 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 189 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Saxton moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
- Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 142.
- Reported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 106-428 .
On October 27, 1999 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Fisheries Conservation, Wildlife and Oceans Discharged.
On October 21, 1999 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On September 29, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries Conservation, Wildlife and Oceans.
On September 27, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Resources.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor