+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On September 28, 1999 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
On September 27, 1999 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 402 - 2 .
- Considered as unfinished business.
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 187 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Duncan moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
On September 24, 1999 in the House:
- House Committee on International Relations Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Oct. 8, 1999.
- Reported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 106-334 , Part I.
On September 23, 1999 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 22, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to House International Relations
- Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
- Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on International Relations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor