+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1092-1093)
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H994)
- Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H994)
- Committee on House Administration discharged.
- Mr. Harper asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor